MA H3445 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5005
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to autocycles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to autocycles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5005 |
2021-11-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3457 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4676
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1402 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied S904
H1649 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3863 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Reported by H4118
H3991 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4600
H4123 (Similar To) 2022-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2022
H4118 (Similar To) 2021-10-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2021
H1112 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2466 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H759 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H1735 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1340 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4696
H3142 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S455 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H5005 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1402 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied S904
H1649 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3863 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Reported by H4118
H3991 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4600
H4123 (Similar To) 2022-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2022
H4118 (Similar To) 2021-10-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2021
H1112 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2466 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H759 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H1735 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1340 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4696
H3142 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S455 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H5005 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3445 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3445.pdf |