MA H3445 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to caregiver authorization affidavits. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to caregiver authorization affidavits
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] |
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2657 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1739 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2608 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4466
S1506 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3538 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4522
H3775 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1739 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2608 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4466
S1506 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3538 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4522
H3775 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3445 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3445.pdf |