MA H3438 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4716

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the transfer of funds in the Commonwealth Transportation Fund. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to maximizing resources for transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4716
2024-01-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-13SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4002 (Similar To) 2023-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4660 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4673 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4716 (Replaced by) 2024-06-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback