MA H3422 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to update penalties and protect electronic privacy. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect electronic privacy

Sponsors

Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]
Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]
Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]
Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. David Biele [D]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1332 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1337 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S861 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - House concurred
H1555 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3478 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3917 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback