MA H3420 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5075
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to dangerous high speed pursuits. Transportation.
Title
Relative to dangerous high speed pursuits
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Carey [D] | Rep. Patricia Duffy [D] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] |
Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] | Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5075 |
2021-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3455 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied H3496
S575 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S1072 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
H1742 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1331 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3520 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1392 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1032 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H5095 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2022
H5075 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1647 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H2541 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5320
H1922 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S575 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S1072 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
H1742 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1331 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3520 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1392 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1032 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H5095 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2022
H5075 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1647 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H2541 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5320
H1922 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3420 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3420.pdf |