MA H3400 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S2263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S2263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Hall-Whitaker Bridge in the city of Beverly. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the Hall-Whitaker Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Accompanied S2263 |
2023-08-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2263 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2857 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3747 (Similar To) 2023-09-14 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4093
H4093 (Similar To) 2023-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2023
H4455 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2857 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3747 (Similar To) 2023-09-14 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4093
H4093 (Similar To) 2023-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2023
H4455 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3400 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3400.pdf |