MA H3396 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to local community master plan transportation demand management. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote transportation demand management

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-17HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-06-17HouseRules suspended
2024-06-17HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-05-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-01-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-13SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H2953 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1226 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Accompanied S765
H87 (Similar To) 2023-09-25 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3624 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
H4576 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback