MA H3390 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to rehabilitate certain regional roadways. Transportation.
Title
To rehabilitate regional roadways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-04-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1526 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
S649 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
H642 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
H4161 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - New draft substituted, see H4528
H4528 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 205 of the Acts of 2024
S649 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
H642 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
H4161 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - New draft substituted, see H4528
H4528 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 205 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3390 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3390.pdf |