MA H3370 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to change the interest rate on treble damages. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing interest liability in treble damage settlements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2598 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2482 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2563 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S871 (Similar To) 2019-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1725 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S967 (Similar To) 2019-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1910 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback