MA H3358 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to airplane noise data collection. Transportation.
Title
Relative to airplane noise data collection and Good Neighbor Policy
Sponsors
Rep. Sally Kerans [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Rep. Jerald Parisella [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1492 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
S931 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1802 (Similar To) 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2257 (Similar To) 2023-09-25 - Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S931 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1802 (Similar To) 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2257 (Similar To) 2023-09-25 - Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3358 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3358.pdf |