MA H3350 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the expansion of bicycle lanes. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the expansion of bicycle lanes
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3349 (Similar To) 2023-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2557 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2557 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3350 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3350.pdf |