MA H3345 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further define miniature beverage containers under the "bottle bill", so-called. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting the proper disposal of miniatures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-09SenateSenate concurred
2022-06-02HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-05-31SenateSenate concurred
2022-05-02HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-02-28SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-09HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-09-07JointHearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H3332 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Senate concurred
H3284 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Senate concurred
S2159 (Similar To) 2022-06-15 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback