MA H3331 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of municipal lighting authorities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the establishment of municipal lighting authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2050 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S2116 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2050 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S2116 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3331 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3331.pdf |