MA H3326 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to assistant registers and administrative deputy assistants for the Middlesex Probate and Family Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to assistant registers and administrative deputy assistants for the Middlesex Probate and Family Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-11-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3325 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3326 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3326.pdf |