MA H3320 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 99-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to abortion and removing obstacles and expanding access to women's reproductive health. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing obstacles and expanding access to women's reproductive health

Sponsors

Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Michael Moran [D]
Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]
Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]
Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]
Rep. Rady Mom [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. William Straus [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Donald Wong [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H3428 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3435 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3433 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3429 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1209 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback