MA H3319 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-05 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mrs. Haddad of Somerset (by request), a petition of Scott L. Ellis for adoption of resolutions by the General Court requesting the Governor (with consent of the council) to remove Susan L. Jacobs from the office of Associate Justice of the Bristol Probate and Family Court of Bristol County. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolutions requesting the Governor (with consent of the council) to remove Susan L. Jacobs from the office of Associate Justice of the Bristol Probate and Family Court of Bristol County

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-05JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H3194 (Similar To) 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2156 (Similar To) 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2163 (Similar To) 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback