MA H3316 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the penalty for the photographing or visual recording of nude or partially nude persons or under or around the certain clothing. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the punishment of the crimes of photographing, videotaping, or electronically surveilling nude or partially nude persons, or the sexual or intimate parts of a person under or around the person’s clothing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S747 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2580
H3305 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S891 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S496 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S876 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3305 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S891 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S496 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S876 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3316 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3316.pdf |