MA H3308 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4145

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relativerelative to voter identification. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to voter identification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4145
2013-12-04JointHearing scheduled for 12/04/2013 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2013-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2013-01-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H4145 (Replaced by) 2014-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback