MA H3302 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the offshore wind industry, workforce development, fisheries and environmental protection. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To promote offshore wind energy and renewables
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4348 |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3067 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H543 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H778 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5307
H3194 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H456 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H358
S1133 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S3063
S2151 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S49 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S2230 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4348 (Replaced by) 2022-03-01 - New draft substituted, see H4515
H1883 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H543 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H778 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5307
H3194 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H456 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H358
S1133 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S3063
S2151 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S49 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S2230 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4348 (Replaced by) 2022-03-01 - New draft substituted, see H4515
H1883 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3302 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3302.pdf |