MA H3290 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to raise the maximum storage charge of involuntarily towed, non-commercial motor vehicles. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the maximum storage charges on motor vehicles involuntarily towed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2238 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S657 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2341 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S657 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2341 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3290 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3290.pdf |