MA H3287 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4367
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-22 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-22 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Cambridge be authorized to establish a one year residency requirement for police and fire department applicants. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the 1-year residency preference for persons being considered for original appointment to the Cambridge Police Force and Fire Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-08-18 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-06-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-06-09 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Public Service |
2016-06-09 | House | Reported on a part of H4367 |
2016-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4367 |
2015-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4367 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Reported, in part, by H4012
H2917 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1627 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H501 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2075 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2184 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H2917 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1627 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H501 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2075 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2184 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3287 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3287.pdf |