MA H3281 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5053

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5053
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to transparency in private utility construction contracts. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transparency in private utility construction contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-07-28HouseNew draft substituted, see H5053
2022-07-28HouseRead second,amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2022-07-28HouseRules suspended
2022-07-28HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2022-07-28HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2022-07-28HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title,see H5053
2022-03-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2021-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H5053 (Replaced by) 2022-07-28 - Read third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback