MA H3280 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the availability of private utility construction contracts. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transparency in private utility construction contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2021-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Reporting date extended to Friday May 20, 2022, pending concurrence
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2173 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback