MA H3280 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Stoughton be authorized to exempt certain employees of the department of public works in said town from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting all offices and positions in the department of public works in the town of Stoughton from the civil service law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-07-27 | House | Enacted |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-06-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-06-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-06-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4733 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 391 of the Acts of 2016
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3280 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3280.pdf |