MA H3280 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge over the Nashua River and routes 62 and 70 in the town of Clinton as the Arthur J. Mayor Memorial Bridge
Title
Designate a certain bridge over the Nashua River and routes 62 and 70 in the town of Clinton as the Arthur J. Mayor Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-04-26 | Enacted | |
2010-04-22 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the Next Session | |
2010-03-22 | Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2010-03-18 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-02-24 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-22 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2010-02-18 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 7/14 at 1:00 AM in Hearing Room B2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h03280.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht03/ht03280.htm |