MA H3278 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing solar neighborhoods. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Establishing solar neighborhoods
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2021-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
H3993 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by H5164
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4091 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4102 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4596
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S2384 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S3124
H1612 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H578 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
H856 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4784
H1451 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4194 (Similar To) 2021-10-05 - Text of House adopted amendments, see S2481
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S217 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H2979 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
S1403 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied H2298
S1504 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S594 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2857
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3993 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by H5164
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4091 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4102 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4596
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S2384 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S3124
H1612 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H578 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
H856 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4784
H1451 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4194 (Similar To) 2021-10-05 - Text of House adopted amendments, see S2481
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S217 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H2979 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
S1403 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied H2298
S1504 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S594 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2857
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3278 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3278.pdf |