MA H3276 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4716

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a program for the construction, reconstruction, and renovation of municipal parking facilities to provide electric vehicle charging stations. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To build future-forward parking structures to promote EV equity and walkable downtowns

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4716
2023-10-23JointHearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-03-13SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4716 (Replaced by) 2024-06-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2222 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2657

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback