MA H3274 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to interviews or questioning conducted for immigration investigations or enforcement purposes. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to access to justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1502 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2795 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H2062 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3371 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H3464 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S940 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S822 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1398 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied S2565
S1894 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1851 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H1387 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback