MA H3246 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4404

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Whelan of Brewster, a petition of Timothy R. Whelan and others extending veterans status for the certain former members of the National Guard and reserves. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending veterans status for the National Guard and reserves

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4404
2019-06-03JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H2395 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2398 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2401 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2541 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Senate concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2386 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S2337 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H4404 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback