MA H3244 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5337
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to extend certain permits and regulatory approvals. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Extending certain permits and approvals
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] | Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] |
Rep. Patricia Duffy [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Richard Haggerty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5337 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H5337 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3244 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3244.pdf |