MA H3244 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing Veterans' Administration patients to ride the Pioneer Valley Transit Authority without cost. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Authorizing Veterans' Administration patients to ride the Pioneer Valley Transit Authority without cost
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3244 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3244.pdf |