MA H3243 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require cities and towns requesting certain exemptions from the civil service law to submit the hiring policies of such municipality to the Secretary of Veteran’s Affairs for approval. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
To protect the veterans hiring preference
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-08-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in 428 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3243 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3243.pdf |