MA H3241 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S530

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Accompanied S530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a trust to provide for the creation and preservation of creative space and presentation space in municipalities. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To preserve space for the creative economy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-04SenateAccompanied S530
2023-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development

Same As/Similar To

S530 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback