MA H3238 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to headstones for long-serving or perished members of the Massachusetts National Guard. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to headstones for long-serving or perished members of the Massachusetts National Guard
Sponsors
Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | House concurred |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-08-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in 428 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2428 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3238 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3238.pdf |