MA H3211 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Nguyen of Andover, a petition of Tram T. Nguyen and others for the annual issuance of a proclamation by the Governor setting apart May 6th as Moyamoya awareness day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating May 6 as Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day
Sponsors
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Maria Robinson [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-10-06 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-01-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-01-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2074 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3211 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3211.pdf |