MA H3211 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4404

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to memorializing the President of the United States to make it the policy of the United States that it will not start a nuclear war and not use nuclear weapons first. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolutions to prevent the first use of nuclear weapons by the United States

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4404
2019-08-30JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H2202 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2165 (Similar To) 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1516 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2157 (Similar To) 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2155 (Similar To) 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3240 (Similar To) 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4404 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback