MA H3204 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the hiring of veterans for state park ranger positions. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to the hiring of veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H3243 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3204 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3204.pdf |