MA H3198 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4486

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Lombardo of Billerica, a petition of Marc T. Lombardo for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) to identify a suitable location for a justice complex in Southern Middlesex County. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve establishing a special commission to identify a suitable location for a justice complex in Southern Middlesex County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-07-18HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4486
2021-09-08JointHearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H609 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4486 (Replaced by) 2022-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback