MA H3162 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize cities and towns to borrow from the Commonwealth without interest for green energy programs for such municipalities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Authorizing borrowing by cities and towns at zero percent from the Commonwealth for green energy sources
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4778 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3162 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3162.pdf |