MA H316 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to imposing surcharges on cardholders who elect to use credit cards in lieu of payment by cash, check or similar means. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Repealing a ban on credit card surcharges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H1006 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1007 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1019 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1207 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H3653 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H958 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1007 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1019 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1207 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H3653 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H958 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H316 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H316.pdf |