MA H3159 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5126
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to littering out of motor vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to littering out of motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5126 |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3051 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3917 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3051 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3917 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3159 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3159.pdf |