MA H311 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to protecting residential electric customers from execution of new contracts for generation services. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to protecting residential electric customers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-06SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-01-21JointHearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H2890 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2925 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1933 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1994 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1944 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S195 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback