MA H3099 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to motor vehicle license suspension record privacy. Transportation.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle license suspension
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, July 3, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 15, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3099 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3099.pdf |