MA H3086 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2978
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize municipalities to assess certain taxes for financing regional transportation needs and investments. Revenue.
Title
Relative to regional ballot initiatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-04-07 | House | Accompanied by H2978 |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1899 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2277 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2902 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2978 (Replaces) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H3086
S2277 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2902 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2978 (Replaces) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H3086
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3086 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3086.pdf |