MA H308 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied S171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied S171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the practice of body piercing, so-called, unless licensed by the Department of Public Health. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Regulating body art
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied S171 |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1460 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S171 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1460 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S171 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H308.pdf |