MA H3075 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representatives Kushmerek of Fitchburg and Diggs of Barnstable, a petition of Michael P. Kushmerek, Kip A. Diggs and others for the issuance of an annual proclamation by the Governor to designate the fourth of February as Rosa Parks day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to Rosa Parks Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1992 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2482 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2548
H4459 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S2482 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2548
H4459 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3075 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3075.pdf |