MA H3061 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Reporting date extended to Friday July 19, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to designation of the state public health laboratory campus in honor of Dr. Alfred DeMaria, Jr. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to designation of the state public health laboratory campus in honor of Dr. Alfred DeMaria, Jr

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-02HouseReporting date extended to Friday July 19, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-05-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-09-22JointHearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S1351 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback