MA H3013 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to sales tax exemptions for gun safes and trigger locks. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sales tax exemptions for gun safes and trigger locks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18JointHearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-12-14JointHearing scheduled for 01/21/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1854 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3016 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1797 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback