MA H3008 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5126

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 69-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the Secretary of Transportation and the Secretary of Energy and Environmental Affairs to establish the modern and sustainable solutions for transportation trust fund. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To advance modern and sustainable solutions for transportation

Sponsors

Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. John Velis [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5126
2019-11-21JointHearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S1190 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2104 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S252 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3134 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3898 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2019
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S1884 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1090 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2778
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback