MA H2998 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain section of State Highway Route 2 in the city of Cambridge and town of Arlington as the James M. Gavin Memorial Highway. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain section of State Highway Route 2 in the city of Cambridge and town of Arlington as the James M. Gavin Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-08-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-08-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-07-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2015 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2998 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2998.pdf |